Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0695835

EP0695835 - Grating for a surface drainage channel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN GMBH & CO. KG
Am Ahlmannkai
24768 Rendsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN GMBH & CO. KG
Am Ahlmannkai
D-24768 Rendsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Sauerwein, Heinrich, Dr.-Ing.
Dorfstrasse 4a
D-24809 Nübbel / DE
02 / Arm, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing.
Stargarder Strasse 17
D-24768 Rendsburg / DE
[1996/06]
Representative(s)Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Bohnenberger, Johannes , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Former [1996/06]Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
D-81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date95115949.030.11.1993
[1996/06]
Priority number, dateDE1992424170510.12.1992         Original published format: DE 4241705
DE1993432781018.08.1993         Original published format: DE 4327810
[1996/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0695835
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0695835
Date:27.03.1996
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0695835
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:E03F5/06, E01C11/22, E02D29/14
[1996/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/06]
TitleGerman:Abdeckrost für eine Oberflächenentwässerungsrinne[1996/06]
English:Grating for a surface drainage channel[1996/06]
French:Grille de recouvrement pour un caniveau d'écoulement de surface[1996/06]
Examination procedure04.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/44]
09.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2000Fee for grant paid
24.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93119304.9  / EP0601447
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
AT30.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
LU30.11.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2003/45]DK26.07.2000
SE26.07.2000
AT30.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/15]SE26.07.2000
AT30.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/13]SE26.07.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/03]SE26.07.2000
BE30.11.2000
Former [2001/26]SE26.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0337110  (VON ROLL AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 16 - line 32; figure 19 *;
 [A]FR2508191  (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 5; figures 5,6 *;
 [A]FR2659096  (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1,4-6 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 10; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]DE8525580U  (ERMOSSA) [A] 4-6 * page 5, paragraph 7 - page 6; figure 4 *;
 [A]GB435872  (BROAD & COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
ExaminationGB2006305
by applicantDE1272241