EP0707934 - Venting moulds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1996/17] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Espie, Jacques 6, allée Jean-Baptiste Lully F-63430 Pont-Du-Chateau / FR | 02 /
Labarre, Daniel 5, Allée Sud, La Raye-Dieu F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 03 /
Rey, Maurice 64, avenue de la République F-63118 Cebazat / FR | [2000/01] |
Former [1996/17] | 01 /
Espie, Jacques 6, allée Jean-Baptiste Lully F-63430 Pont-Du-Chateau / FR | ||
02 /
Labarre, Daniel 5, Allée Sud, La Raye Dieu F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | |||
03 /
Rey, Maurice 64, avenue de la République F-63118 Cebazat / FR | Representative(s) | Bauvir, Jacques Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | ||
Former [1996/17] | Bauvir, Jacques Michelin & Cie, Service SK-PI F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 95115959.9 | 10.10.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | FR19940012654 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: FR 9412654 | [1996/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0707934 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0707934 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/10, // B29L30:00 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
B29C33/10 (EP,KR,US);
B29D30/08 (KR);
B29D2030/0617 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US);
Y10S425/812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU [1996/17] | Title | German: | Entlüftung von Formen | [1996/17] | English: | Venting moulds | [1996/17] | French: | Eventation de moules | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61252109 ; | [YA]FR1394552 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO) [Y] 7,9 * figure -; claim - *[A] 6,8; | [XY]DE1965121 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [X] 1-4,6,8 * page 4, paragraph 1; claims 1,3-5 * [Y] 5,7,9,10; | [YA]US3822857 (TANIE H) [Y] 5,10 * the whole document * [A] 6,8; | [Y]US4740145 (SHURMAN LOUIS W [US]) [Y] 5 * figure -; claim - *; | [DX]EP0576892 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [DX] 1 * column 4, line 34 - column 4, line 43 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870331), vol. 011, no. 102, Database accession no. (M - 576), & JP61252109 A 19861110 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * abstract * | by applicant | US3854852 | US4447197 | US5234326 | EP0576892 |