Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0709269

EP0709269 - Floating support of a window for vehicles, especially for railway vehicles used for regional traffic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DWA Deutsche Waggonbau GmbH
Kablower Weg 89
12526 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
HÜBNER Gummi- und Kunststoff GmbH
Agathofstrasse 15
D-34123 Kassel / DE
[1999/04]
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
Deutsche Waggonbau AG
Adlergestell 598
D-12527 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
HÜBNER Gummi- und Kunststoff GmbH
Agathofstrasse 15
D-34123 Kassel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haring, Lothar
Hallesche Str. 20
D-06188 Niemberg / DE
02 / Mosaner, Olaf
Riedwiesen 39
D-34130 Kassel / DE
[1996/18]
Application number, filing date95116446.619.10.1995
[1996/18]
Priority number, dateDE1994443826626.10.1994         Original published format: DE 4438266
DE199511941526.05.1995         Original published format: DE 19519415
[1996/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0709269
Date:01.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0709269
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B61D25/00, B60J10/02
[1996/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/18]
TitleGerman:Schwimmende Fensterhalterung für Fahrzeuge, insbesondere für Nahverkehrsschienenfahrzeuge[1996/18]
English:Floating support of a window for vehicles, especially for railway vehicles used for regional traffic[1996/18]
French:Support flottant d'une fenêtre pour véhicules, notamment pour véhicules ferroviaires de trafic régional[1996/18]
Examination procedure17.05.1996Examination requested  [1996/29]
31.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1999Fee for grant paid
14.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB2093106  (COMIND SPA AZIENDA AGES) [X] 1 * page 1, line 129 - page 2, line 83; figures 2-8 * [A] 4;
 [XA]US2532130  (TURNER CHARLES H) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 4;
 [A]US2356878  (PAINTER FRANK F) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE899152  (SVEN AXEL ERIKSSON DIPL ING) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDD101622
 DE8116661U
 DE7005883U