Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0707963

EP0707963 - Ink jet head, ink jet head cartridge and ink jet apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/17]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishinaga, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Masuda, Kazuaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Shimoda, Junji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Kasamoto, Masami, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
05 / Murooka, Fumio, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
06 / Furukawa, Tatsuo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
07 / Kawai, Jun, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
08 / Maru, Hiroyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
09 / Arashima, Teruo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
10 / Izumida, Masaaki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
11 / Misumi, Yoshinori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
12 / Kamiyama, Yuji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/17]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/17]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date95116587.720.10.1995
[1996/17]
Priority number, dateJP1994025563120.10.1994         Original published format: JP 25563194
[1996/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0707963
Date:24.04.1996
Language:EN
[1996/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0707963
Date:12.03.1997
[1997/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0707963
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.1997
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/05, B41J2/14
[1997/11]
Former International [1996/17]B41J2/05
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/17]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlkopf, Tintenstrahlkopfkassette und Tintenstrahlapparat[1996/17]
English:Ink jet head, ink jet head cartridge and ink jet apparatus[1996/17]
French:Tête à jet d'encre, cartouche de tête à jet d'encre et appareil à jet d'encre[1996/17]
Examination procedure20.10.1995Examination requested  [1996/17]
02.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.1999Fee for grant paid
11.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99108703.2  / EP0934829
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0124312  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-5,8-11 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 10 * * page 8, line 27 - line 30 * * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0613781  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 6,12-16 * column 4, line 39 - line 44 * * figures 5,6; claims 18-29 *;
 [A]US4251824  (HARA TOSHITAMI, et al) [A] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - line 50 * * column 5, line 26 - line 32 * * column 11, line 26 - line 29 * * figure 2C; claim - *;
 [A]US4646110  (IKEDA MASAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,8-11 * column 2, line 20 - line 61 * * column 3, line 23 - line 49 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 2 * * column 10, line 21 - column 11, line 9 * * figures 2A,2B,2C; claims 1,9 *;
 [A]JPH02239940  ;
 [A]JPS6235852  ;
 [A]JPH01235652
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901214), vol. 014, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1058), [A] 1-5,7-11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870717), vol. 011, no. 221, Database accession no. (M - 608), [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891214), vol. 013, no. 565, Database accession no. (M - 907), [A] 1,2 * abstract *
by applicantJPS55132259