Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0710779

EP0710779 - Sliding unit for a brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1996/19]Sliding unit for a brake and method of producing the same
[1999/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [1996/19]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Iwao
Mitsubishi Chem. Corp., 1, Bannosu-cho, Sakaide
Kagawa 762 / JP
02 / Niwa, Kazuo
Mitsubishi Chem. Corp., 1, Bannosu-cho, Sakaide
Kagawa 762 / JP
03 / Seki, Hitoshi
Mitsubishi Chem. Corp., 1, Bannosu-cho, Sakaide
Kagawa 762 / JP
04 / Kusahara, Toshio
Mitsubishi Chem. Corp., 1, Bannosu-cho, Sakaide
Kagawa 762 / JP
05 / Inoue, Yoshiaki
Mitsubishi Chem. Corp., 1, Bannosu-cho, Sakaide
Kagawa 762 / JP
[1996/19]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/19]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date95116685.923.10.1995
[1996/19]
Priority number, dateJP1994026053625.10.1994         Original published format: JP 26053694
JP1994026284626.10.1994         Original published format: JP 26284694
JP1994026977902.11.1994         Original published format: JP 26977994
[1996/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0710779
Date:08.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0710779
Date:15.05.1996
[1996/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0710779
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP28.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:F16D69/02
[1996/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/19]
TitleGerman:Gleiteinheit für Bremse[1999/26]
English:Sliding unit for a brake[1999/26]
French:Unité de glissement pour frein[1999/26]
Former [1996/19]Gleiteinheit für Bremse und Verfahren zur Herstellung
Former [1996/19]Sliding unit for a brake and method of producing the same
Former [1996/19]Unité de glissement pour frein et méthode de fabrication
Examination procedure05.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
14.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99109109.1  / EP0931954
Opposition(s)23.12.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR22.03.2000
DE24.06.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2002/13]DE24.06.2000
FR18.08.2000
Former [2001/16]FR18.08.2000
Documents cited:Search[YPA]US5398784  (HANEDA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [YP] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 8 - line 25 * * column 2, line 15 - line 51 * * column 3, line 8 - line 39 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 66 * [A] 3,4;
 JPH05126181  [ ] (NISSIN KOGYO KK, et al);
 JPH06159414  [ ] (NISSIN KOGYO KK, et al);
 JPH06159413  [ ] (NISSIN KOGYO KK, et al);
 JPH06159412  [ ] (NISSIN KOGYO KK, et al);
 [Y]JPH0446010  ;
 [Y]JPH07180735  ;
 [Y]JPS6376926  ;
 [Y]JPH04224327  ;
 [Y]JPH04231739
 [Y]  1, Database accession no. 92-117874, [Y] 1,6,7 * abstract *
 [Y]  1, Database accession no. 95-281504, [Y] 1,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  1, Database accession no. 88-135881, [Y] 1,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  1, Database accession no. 92-320026, [Y] 1,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  1, Database accession no. 92-326935, [Y] 1,6 * abstract *