EP0714189 - Receiver for multicarrier signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/22] | For all designated states PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Koji 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Toshihito 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Ohsawa, Susumu 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Takayama, Masami 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Kuriki, Yuki 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi, Ohaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | [1996/22] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Manfred, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Finsterwald, Manfred, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/22] | Finsterwald, Manfred, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95116689.1 | 23.10.1995 | [1996/22] | Priority number, date | JP19940258196 | 24.10.1994 Original published format: JP 25819694 | [1996/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0714189 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0714189 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/16, H03J7/04, H04L27/26, H04L5/06 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
H04L27/2647 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/22] | H04L5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/22] | Title | German: | Empfänger für Mehrträgersignale | [1996/22] | English: | Receiver for multicarrier signals | [1996/22] | French: | Récepteur pour signaux à plusieurs porteuses | [1996/22] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 22.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/12] | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4580290 (USHIDA SUSUMU [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - line 67 * * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0305604 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * column 9, line 22 - line 25 * | by applicant | JPH05504037 | WO1991FR00951 | WO1989FR00546 |