Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0709432

EP0709432 - Polycarbonate resin composition and exterior automotive trim using same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
[2000/02]
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO., LTD.
6-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Umeda, Takashi, c/o Idemitsu Petrochemical Co, Ltd
1-1, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Nakazato, Teruhiko, c/o Idemitsu Petrochem Co, Ltd
1-1, Anesakikaigan
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1996/18]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/18]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date95116836.826.10.1995
[1996/18]
Priority number, dateJP1994026649831.10.1994         Original published format: JP 26649894
[1996/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0709432
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0709432
Date:10.07.1996
[1996/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0709432
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C08L69/00, C08K3/34, C08L83/10, C08K9/04, // (C08L69/00, 67:02)
[1996/27]
Former International [1996/18]C08L69/00, C08K3/34, // (C08L69/00, 67:02)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/18]
TitleGerman:Polycarbonatzusammensetzung und Aussenbekleidung für Kraftfahrzeuge daraus[1996/18]
English:Polycarbonate resin composition and exterior automotive trim using same[1996/18]
French:Composition de polycarbonate et revêtement extérieure pour véhicules automobiles à partie de cette composition[1996/18]
Examination procedure13.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/07]
10.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.1999Fee for grant paid
26.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT12.01.2000
[2008/05]
Documents cited:Search[DY]JPH05222283  ;
 [Y]WO8202398  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-20 * page 1, line 8 - page 4, line 5; claims 1,2,4-13 *;
 [A]EP0193060  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * claims 1-6 *;
 [A]US4161469  (LEGRAND DONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]EP0135904  (MOBAY CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,7-12 * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]FR2343778  (UNIBRA SA [BE]) [A] 1,2,19 * claims 1-4 *
 [DY]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 39, Database accession no. 93-309315, XP002002307 & JPH05222283 A 19930831 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEM CO) [DY] 1-4,7-20 * abstract *
by applicantJPH05222283
 JPS4829308B
 JPS559435B
 JPS646051
 JPS6479257