Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0710508

EP0710508 - Process for making coatings having three dimensional optical effects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [1996/19]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Richter, Hans Jürgen, Dr.
Gaisbergstr. 91
D-69115 Heidelberg / DE
02 / Schwab, Ekkehard, Dr.
Berwartsteinstr. 4
D-67434 Neustadt / DE
03 / Schmid, Raimund, Dr.
Im Falkenhorst 1
D-67435 Neustadt / DE
04 / Mronga, Norbert, Dr.
Ringstr. 2
D-69221 Dossenheim / DE
05 / Ostertag, Werner, Dr.
Oberer Bergelweg 2
D-67269 Grünstadt / DE
06 / Schmidt, Helmut
Werfelstr. 22
D-67574 Osthofen / DE
[1996/19]
Application number, filing date95116928.327.10.1995
[1996/19]
Priority number, dateDE1994443945504.11.1994         Original published format: DE 4439455
[1996/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0710508
Date:08.05.1996
Language:DE
[1996/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:B05D3/14, B41M3/14, B44F7/00, B05D5/06
[1996/19]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1996/19]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von dreidimensionale optische Effekte aufweisenden Beschichtungen[1996/19]
English:Process for making coatings having three dimensional optical effects[1996/19]
French:Procédé pour fabriquer des revêtments ayant des effets optiques tri-dimensionnels[1996/19]
File destroyed:13.09.2003
Examination procedure16.04.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/24]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2006848  (MAGNETFABRIEK BONN GMBH) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0406667  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0556449  (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0428933  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE3938055  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1;
 [A]FR2069355  (EMI LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4186944  (PEARCE RALPH R [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4511616  (PITTS WARREN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]BE678945  (TEFAL S.A.) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US2570856  (CARLTON PRATT BURT, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2570856
 DE3938055
 DE4313541
 DE4340141
 DE4419173