Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0716370

EP0716370 - A disk access method for delivering multimedia and video information on demand over wide area networks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2012  [2012/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kouloheris, Jack L.
42 Old Farm Lane
Mohegan, New York 10547 / US
02 / Kumar, Manoj
2H Overlook Commons
Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Teufel, Fritz , et al
IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH
Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht
71137 Ehningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1996/24]Lindner-Vogt, Karin, Dipl.-Phys.
IBM Deutschland, Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht
70548 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95117739.310.11.1995
[1996/24]
Priority number, dateUS1994035036406.12.1994         Original published format: US 350364
[1996/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0716370
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0716370
Date:16.02.2005
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06, H04N7/173
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/24]
TitleGerman:Ein Plattenzugangsverfahren, um Multimedia- und Videoinformation auf Wunsch über Grossraumnetze zu liefern[1996/24]
English:A disk access method for delivering multimedia and video information on demand over wide area networks[1996/24]
French:Méthode d'accès de disque pour délivrer une information de type multimédia et vidéo à la demande sur des réseaux étendus[1996/24]
Examination procedure29.10.1996Examination requested  [1996/52]
26.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/06]
23.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/06]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
09.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
22.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
17.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 12
16.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 13
17.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 14
18.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 15
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 16
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201117   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9412937  (STARLIGHT NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1-4,6-12 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 16 * * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 4a-5; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0573308  (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - line 58 * * column 13, line 37 - column 15, line 20 *;
 [PA]WO9429796  (NETWORK APPLIANCE CORP [US]) [PA] 1-3,6-12 * page 3, line 1 - line 13 * * page 6, line 10 - line 18 * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 3 * * figures 1,10 *;
 [Y]  - KEETON K ET AL, "STORAGE ALTERNATIVES FOR VIDEO SERVICE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS. TOWARDS DISTRIBUTED STORAGE AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. ANNECY, JUNE 12 - 16, 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19940612), vol. SYMP. 13, ISBN 0-8186-5582-8, pages 100 - 105, XP000493024 [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * page 102, column L, line 1 - line 16 * * page 101, column L, line 37 - line 53 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373040
 [Y]  - LOUGHER P ET AL, "THE IMPACT OF DIGITAL AUDIO AND VIDEO ON HIGH-SPEED STORAGE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS. TOWARDS DISTRIBUTED STORAGE AND DATA MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS. ANNECY, JUNE 12 - 16, 1994, LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19940612), vol. SYMP. 13, ISBN 0-8186-5582-8, pages 84 - 89, XP000493022 [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373037
 [A]  - CHANG E ET AL, "Variable bit rate MPEG video storage on parallel disk arrays", COMMUNITY NETWORKING INTEGRATED MULTIMEDIA SERVICES TO THE HOME, 1994., PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1ST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 13-14 JULY 1994, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, (19940713), ISBN 0-7803-2076-X, pages 127 - 137, XP010124398 [A] 1,4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CN.1994.337356
 [DA]  - CHEN P M ET AL, "RAID: HIGH-PERFORMANCE, RELIABLE SECONDARY STORAGE", ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940601), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0360-0300, pages 145 - 185, XP000672139 [DA] 1-12 * page 146, column R, line 51 - page 147, column L, line 1 * * page 151 - page 152, paragraph 3.1 * * page 171, column R, paragraph 4.4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/176979.176981
 [PA]  - TOBAGI F ET AL, "STREAMING RAID- A DISK ARRAY MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR VIDEO FILES", COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY REVIEW, WESTWORLD PRODUCTION CO. LOS ANGELES, US, (19941221), ISSN 0278-9647, pages 66,68,81 - 83, XP000429677 [PA] 1
by applicantUS5148432
 US5163131
    - KEETON ET AL., "Storage Alternatives for Video Service", PROCEEDINGS ON 13THE IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON MASS STORAGE SYSTEMS, (19940612), doi:doi:10.1109/MASS.1994.373040, pages 100 - 105, XP000493024

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MASS.1994.373040