blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0713143 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0713143



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 194
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.02.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.02.2000 Communication in response to a request to amend the documents for grant Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.12.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 45
28.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
28.12.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.09.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
16.09.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
18.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
18.05.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 42
03.05.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
07.05.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.05.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
08.02.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.02.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.01.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 32
10.11.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.11.1995 Claims Search / examination 3
10.11.1995 Description Search / examination 39
10.11.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.11.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6