blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0713143


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
20.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.01.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.12.1999 Renewal fee
21.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant
21.09.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.1999 First examination report
12.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
04.12.1998 Renewal fee
05.12.1997 Renewal fee
05.09.1997 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.1997 [1997/43]
09.05.1997 Publication of search report published on  25.06.1997 [1997/26]
18.04.1997 Change - classification published on  04.06.1997 [1997/23]
18.04.1997 Change - classification published on  04.06.1997 [1997/23]
04.04.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.05.1996 [1996/21]