blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0713143
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3290316BGlobal Dossier 10.06.2002B2
JPH08146596 07.06.1996A
Priority number Date
JP28544794 18.11.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0713143Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0713143 25.06.1997A3
EP0713143 22.05.1996A2
Priority number Date
JP28544794 18.11.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516486D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP28544794 18.11.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516486T 07.09.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP28544794 18.11.1994