blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0713143

Designated contracting states DE 
 GB 
Examination procedure28.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted26.04.2000
Opposition procedure27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 11.04.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.05.1996 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE GB
 
Event date:04.06.1997 
Event description:MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G03F 7/105
 
Event date:25.06.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):DE GB
 
Event date:22.10.1997 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19970821
 
Event date:30.06.1999 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19990518
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE GB
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69516486
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000531
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:22.09.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:11.04.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:11.04.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20071108
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20071107
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:29.07.2009 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20081110
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090603
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081110