Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0713143

EP0713143 - Photosensitive planographic printing plate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagashima, Akira, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP
02 / Kawamura, Koichi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
4000, Kawashiri, Yoshida-cho
Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95117807.810.11.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateJP1994028544718.11.1994         Original published format: JP 28544794
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0713143
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0713143
Date:25.06.1997
[1997/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0713143
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/105, G03F7/022
[1997/23]
Former International [1996/21]G03F7/022
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Lichtempfindliche Flachdruckplatte[1996/21]
English:Photosensitive planographic printing plate[1996/21]
French:Plaque photosensible pour l'impression planographique[1996/21]
Examination procedure21.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/43]
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
24.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.1999Fee for grant paid
28.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0684521  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-5 * page 20, lines 26-39; examples 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0566353  (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * claim 1; tables 3,4 *;
 [A]US4544627  (TAKAHASHI YONOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 20, line 46 - column 21, line 34; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4457025  (MERYASH HARRIETTE E [US]) [Y] 1-5 * column 5, lines 22-37 * * column 7, lines 43-54 *;
 [A]US4160671  (STAHLHOFEN PAUL) [A] 1-5 * column 3, lines 13-45; claim 1 *;
 [A]JPH03249651
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920205), vol. 16, no. 46, Database accession no. (P - 1307), [A] 1-5 * abstract *
by applicantJPS61203443
 JPH0431104B
 US3635709
 GB1494043
 US4028111
 US3759711
 US3046120
 US3188210
 JPS475303
 JPS4863802
 JPS4863803
 JPS4896575
 JPS4938701
 JPS4813354
 JPS4111222B
 JPS459610B
 JPS4917481B
 US2797213
 US3454400
 US3544323
 US3573917
 US3674495
 US3785825
 GB1227602
 GB1251345
 GB1267005
 GB1329888
 GB1330932
 DE854890
 JPS61217034
 JPS5134711
 JPH02866
 US4123279
 JPH05313359
 JPS5036209
 JPS5336223
 JPS5562444
 JPS5577742
 JPS62170950
    - T.H. JAMES, The Theory of Photographic Process, NEW YORK, MACMILLAN CO., (1977),
    - F.M. HAMER, The Cyanine Dyes and Related Compounds, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS CO., (1964),
    - APPLICATION CONTAINS STILL MORE REFERENCES,