Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0712893

EP0712893 - Plastic compositions and plastic cards made thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.02.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI PLASTICS, INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2008/13]
Former [1999/32]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [1996/21]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI PLASTICS INC.
5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiyama, Masayoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Plastics Inc.
Hiratsuka Kojo, 2480, Shindo
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Suzuki, Nobuyasu, c/o Mitsubishi Plastics Inc.
Hiratsuka Kojo, 2480, Shindo
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Yamaoka, Tetsuya, c/o Mitsubishi Plastics Inc.
Hiratsuka Kojo, 2480, Shindo
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[1996/21]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/21]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date95117874.813.11.1995
[1996/21]
Priority number, dateJP1994027942514.11.1994         Original published format: JP 27942594
JP1995018275419.07.1995         Original published format: JP 18275495
[1996/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0712893
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0712893
Date:26.03.1997
[1997/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0712893
Date:11.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/32]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0712893
Date:26.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08L25/12, C08L35/06, C08L51/06, C08L55/02, B42D15/10
[1996/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/21]
TitleGerman:Kunststoffzusammensetzungen und die daraus hergestellten Kunststoffkarten[1996/21]
English:Plastic compositions and plastic cards made thereof[1996/21]
French:Compositions plastiques et cartes en plastique fabriquées à partir de ces compositions[1996/21]
Examination procedure01.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/44]
11.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.05.1999Fee for grant paid
05.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.05.2000  12.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/38]
Opponent(s)01  04.05.2000  12.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2006/20]
Opponent(s)01  04.05.2000  12.05.2000  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2000/26]
Opponent(s)01  04.05.2000   
BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
20.06.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.12.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2001Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2001Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
24.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.12.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
30.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
10.07.2007Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.07.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.11.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
08.02.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition24.01.2003Appeal received No.  T0431/03
16.04.2003Statement of grounds filed
03.05.2006Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.05.2006Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB13.11.2005
FR31.07.2006
[2007/30]
Former [2007/16]GB13.11.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1526627  (MONSANTO CO) [A] 1-9 * page 1, column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 60 * * page 5, column 2, line 110 - page 6, column 1, line 93 *;
 [A]DE3232032  (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 11, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]DE4214846  (BUNA AG) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 33 - line 51 *;
 [A]DE1950622  (DART INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-9 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1 *
OppositionDE2927572
 DE3422919
 EP0062223
 EP0267826
 JPS59168016