Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0712893 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0712893



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1012
15.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
11.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
29.02.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.02.2008 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.02.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
08.02.2008 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
08.02.2008 French translation of claims Opposition 3
08.02.2008 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
15.11.2007 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
15.11.2007 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
15.11.2007 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
08.11.2007 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.07.2007 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2007 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.07.2007 Text intended for grant Opposition 28
13.02.2007 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.01.2007 Description Opposition 26
31.01.2007 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
30.10.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
30.10.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.10.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.2006 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 30
11.05.2006 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
02.05.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
07.04.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.04.2006 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.04.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
05.04.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
05.04.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.04.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 10
27.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
27.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
27.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
27.03.2006 Claims Appeal 1
27.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.03.2006 General authorisation Appeal 1
24.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.03.2006 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 16
06.03.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.03.2006 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
24.02.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.02.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
07.02.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.02.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
01.02.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 2
31.03.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.03.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
23.03.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
03.11.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.10.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
13.10.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.09.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
29.08.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.05.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.04.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.04.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.04.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.04.2003 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
17.04.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 45
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
17.04.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
17.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
16.04.2003 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 23
29.01.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.01.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.01.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.12.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.12.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
20.12.2002 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 3
20.12.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.12.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
20.12.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.09.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.09.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.08.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
31.08.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
31.08.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
31.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
31.08.2002 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
31.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
23.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
23.08.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 22
17.12.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 3
29.11.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.11.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
11.10.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.10.2001 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
28.09.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.09.2001 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.09.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.09.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
26.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
26.09.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
18.09.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
25.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.07.2001 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
25.07.2001 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
20.07.2001 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 6
13.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.02.2001 Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.01.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.12.2000 Claims Opposition 2
29.12.2000 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
27.10.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.10.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.06.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.06.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
14.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.05.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
09.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
09.05.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
09.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
09.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
09.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 45
09.05.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
04.05.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
01.07.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.05.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
05.05.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.05.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.02.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.01.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.10.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
20.10.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 102
02.10.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
19.03.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
19.03.1998 Description Search / examination 19
19.03.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.11.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.09.1997 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
06.01.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.01.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
26.01.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
26.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 13
26.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 23
26.01.1996 Translation of priority document Search / examination 30
26.01.1996 Translation of priority document Search / examination 18
13.11.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.11.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
13.11.1995 Description Search / examination 73
13.11.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6