blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0720004

EP0720004 - FDIC-method for minimising measurement errors in a measurement arrangement with redundant sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LITEF GmbH
Lörracher Strasse 18
79115 Freiburg / DE
[2000/07]
Former [1996/27]For all designated states
LITEF GmbH
Lörracher Strasse 18
D-79115 Freiburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Harald, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Malteser-Ordens-Strasse 1f
D-79111 Freiburg / DE
[1996/27]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E., et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/12]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1996/27]TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date95117943.114.11.1995
[1996/27]
Priority number, dateDE1994444690027.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4446900
[1996/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0720004
Date:03.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0720004
Date:07.08.1996
[1996/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0720004
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.1996
ClassificationIPC:G01D3/08
[1996/27]
CPC:
G01D3/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/27]
TitleGerman:FDIC-Verfahren zur Minimierung von Messfehlern in einer Messanordnung von redundanten Sensoren[1996/27]
English:FDIC-method for minimising measurement errors in a measurement arrangement with redundant sensors[1996/27]
French:Procédé FDIC pour minimiser les erreurs de mesure dans un dispositif de mesure à capteurs redondants[1996/27]
Examination procedure10.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/06]
08.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.1999Fee for grant paid
17.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES16.02.2000
FR16.02.2000
IT16.02.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]ES16.02.2000
FR16.02.2000
Former [2002/26]ES16.02.2000
FR13.07.2000
Former [2001/16]FR13.07.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0416370  (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 14 - line 51 *;
 [X]DE4100501  (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [X] 1* column 5, line 54 - column 8, line 23 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.