Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0770895

EP0770895 - Projection optical system and exposure apparatus provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2006Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 23.08.2006  [2006/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Former [1997/18]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuzawa, Hitoshi
34-17, Okusawa 2-chome, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Suenaga, Yutaka
412-5-624, Imai-cho, Hodogaya-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1997/18]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/18]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date95118152.817.11.1995
[1997/18]
Priority number, dateJP1995026393212.10.1995         Original published format: JP 26393295
[1997/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0770895
Date:02.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0770895
Date:08.10.1997
[1997/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0770895
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0770895
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:G02B13/14, G02B13/26, G03F7/20, G02B13/22, G02B13/24
[1997/39]
Former International [1997/18]G02B13/14, G02B13/26, G03F7/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/18]
TitleGerman:Optisches Projektionssystem mit Belichtungsgerät[1997/18]
English:Projection optical system and exposure apparatus provided therewith[1997/18]
French:Système de projection optique avec appareil d'exposition[1997/18]
Examination procedure06.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/15]
04.03.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.04.2003Fee for grant paid
10.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.03.2004  28.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang
Adolf - Lüken - Höflich - Sawodny
Dreiköniggasse 10
89073 Ulm / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/22]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2004  28.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Adolf - Lüken - Höflich - Sawodny Dreiköniggasse 10
89073 Ulm / DE
Former [2004/25]
Opponent(s)01  24.03.2004  28.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Dr. Weitzel & Partner, Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2004/21]
Opponent(s)01  23.03.2004   
Carl Zeiss SMT AG
Carl-Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Dr. Weitzel & Partner, Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
04.05.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
02.08.2005Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.11.2005Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.11.2005Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.04.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.07.2006Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5159496  (KATAOKA YOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]US4080048  (KIMURA TADASHI) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]US5260832  (TOGINO TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]US3737215  (DE JAGER D) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]WO9304391  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]US5105075  (OHTA MASAKATU [JP], et al) [A] 1,18 * column W *;
 [A]US4666273  (SHIMIZU HISAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,18 * column W *
ExaminationJPS63118115
 JPH04157412
 JPH05173065
 US4497015
 US5197893
 US5253110
 US5333035
 US5379091
 US5245384
 US5691802
 US5534970
 US5591958
 US5506684
 US3391974
 US3909115
 US4770477
 US4772107
 US4811055
 US48941663
 US4977426
 US5097291
 US5132845
 JPH07140384
 JPH07140385
 SU1659955
    - Naumann, Schröder: Bauelemente der Optik, 6. Auflage 1992 (München, Wien) S. 379, 393
    - E. Glatzel: Zeiss Informationen 26, 8-13 (1981) Heft 92
    - W. Emmerich, C. Hofmann: Jenaer Rundschau 4 (1986) S. 193-196
    - Smith, Warren et al.: Modern Lens Design ISBN 0-07-059178-4 McGraw Hill 1992, chapt. 3.3
by applicantJPS63118115
 JPH04157412
 JPH05173065
 US4497015
 US4666273
 US5194893
 US5253110
 US5333035
 US5379091
 US5245384
 US19940255927
 US19940260398
 US19940299305
 JP19940271631
 JP19950047142