Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718745

EP0718745 - Gas stove with switching unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
[1998/29]
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
D-81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Vodermaier, Lorenz
Anning Nr. 6
D-83368 St. Georgen / DE
02 / Fleissner, Reinhard
Adalbert-Stifter-Str. 17
D-83352 Altenmarkt / DE
[1996/26]
Application number, filing date95118380.522.11.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateDE19940020804U23.12.1994         Original published format: DE 9420804 U
[1996/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0718745
Date:26.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0718745
Date:02.01.1997
[1997/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718745
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1996
ClassificationInternational:G05G5/04, G05G7/02, // F24C3/12
[1997/01]
Former International [1996/26]G05G5/04, // F24C3/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Gasherd mit Schalteinheit[1996/26]
English:Gas stove with switching unit[1996/26]
French:Cuisinière à gaz avec unité de commutation[1996/26]
Examination procedure04.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
30.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.1999Fee for grant paid
10.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
15.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2225826  (BALAY SA [ES]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [Y]FR2235790  (HEHL KARL [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE3412517  (KLOECKNER MOELLER ELEKTRIZIT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *