Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0724079

EP0724079 - Steam injector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helmut Bälz GmbH
Koepffstrasse 5
D-74076 Heilbronn / DE
[1996/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Bälz, Helmut
Koepffstrasse 5
D-74076 Heilbronn / DE
02 / Ehrhardt, G., Dr.-Ing.
Nerscheider Weg 36
D-52076 Aachen / DE
03 / Hesselbacher, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Reisbergstrasse 15
D-74199 Untergruppenbach / DE
[1996/31]
Representative(s)Rüger Abel
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 04 61
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/31]Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel
Postfach 348
73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE
Application number, filing date95118403.523.11.1995
[1996/31]
Priority number, dateDE199510253927.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19502539
[1996/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0724079
Date:31.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0724079
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:F04F5/24, F28C3/08, F22D1/28
[1996/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1996/31]
TitleGerman:Dampfinjektor[1996/31]
English:Steam injector[1996/31]
French:Injecteur de vapeur[1996/31]
Examination procedure16.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
14.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.06.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1999Fee for grant paid
08.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.05.2000
GB17.05.2000
IT17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
DK17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
AT23.11.2000
LU23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
[2008/05]
Former [2006/14]FR17.05.2000
GB17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
DK17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
AT23.11.2000
LU23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2004/39]GB17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
DK17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
AT23.11.2000
LU23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2003/45]GB17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
DK17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
AT23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2003/08]GB17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
AT23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/15]GB17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
AT23.11.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/13]GB17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
BE30.11.2000
CH30.11.2000
LI30.11.2000
Former [2002/03]GB17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
BE30.11.2000
Former [2001/27]GB17.05.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/24]GB17.05.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/17]GB17.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]GB612839  (SPIRAX MFG COMPANY LTD, et al) [A] 1,24 * page 2, line 98 - page 3, line 82; figure - *;
 [A]GB1397435  (HULL F R) [A] 1,24 * page 6, line 34 - line 117; figure 4 *;
 [A]GB790459  (SCHIFF AND STERN GES M B H) [A] 1,24 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1803054  (BROIDO BENJAMIN N) [A] 1,24 * page 2, line 104 - page 3, line 67; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE268934  (GÜMBEL)
by applicantDE2346112