blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0714702


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
15.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.12.1999 Renewal fee
28.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
28.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
04.06.1999 Examination report or reply
19.01.1999 Examination report or reply
14.01.1999 Examination report or reply
11.12.1998 Renewal fee
04.09.1998 First examination report
01.09.1998 Examination report or reply
05.12.1997 Renewal fee
16.08.1996 Request for examination filed published on  02.10.1996 [1996/40]
19.04.1996 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.06.1996 [1996/23]