blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0714702
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3684382BGlobal Dossier 17.08.2005B2
JPH08323227 10.12.1996A
Priority number Date
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3503000BGlobal Dossier 02.03.2004B2
JPH08108083 30.04.1996A
Priority number Date
JP27281994 12.10.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3379003BGlobal Dossier 17.02.2003B2
JPH08155315 18.06.1996A
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2160315 04.10.2005C
CA2160315 13.04.1996A1
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1121276C 17.09.2003C
CN1132117 02.10.1996A
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2294213 24.06.1998B
GB2294213 24.04.1996A
GB9519931D 29.11.1995D0
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100374677B 21.04.2003B1
KR960013464 22.05.1996A
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW288995B 21.10.1996B
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5687922 18.11.1997A
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP27281994 12.10.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0714702Global Dossier 26.04.2000B1
EP0714702 05.06.1996A1
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516487D 31.05.2000D1
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516487T 01.02.2001T2
Priority number Date
JP32936094 02.12.1994
JP16011595 02.06.1995