Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0714702

Designated contracting states DE 
 IE 
 NL 
Examination procedure02.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted26.04.2000
Opposition procedure27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 11.04.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.06.1996 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE IE NL
 
Event date:02.10.1996 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19960807
 
Event date:21.10.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980904
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE IE NL
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69516487
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000531
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.05.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:22.09.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED
 
Event date:11.04.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:22.09.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20060922
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:28.11.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20061128
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:30.11.2006 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20061130
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:01.08.2008 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20080601
 
Event date:20.08.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080603
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20071126
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080601