Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0714702

EP0714702 - Pulverizer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nipponkoatsudenki Kabushikikaisha
1-5 Hamanaka-cho, Minami-ku Nagoya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
Nipponkoatsudenki Kabushikikaisha
1-5 Hamanaka-cho, Minami-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takaoka, Shoji
1-82-1 Mikanyama-chi, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
European Patent Attorneys
Patenta
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/23]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date95118550.324.11.1995
[1996/23]
Priority number, dateJP1994032936002.12.1994         Original published format: JP 32936094
JP1995016011502.06.1995         Original published format: JP 16011595
[1996/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0714702
Date:05.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0714702
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:B02C2/10, A47J42/02
[1996/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IE,   NL [1996/23]
TitleGerman:Feinmahlanlage[1996/23]
English:Pulverizer[1996/23]
French:Pulvérisateur[1996/23]
Examination procedure07.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/40]
04.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2000Fee for grant paid
02.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4613086  (GRANUM MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-7 * [A] 4,11 [Y] 2,3,6,8-10;
 [Y]US3952958  (RICH DENNIS E) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 12 - line 36 * * column 7, line 3 - line 26; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]FR1240906  (A. MOURIER) [Y] 6 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE3819138  (GRIESER MASCHINENBAU [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 18 - line 21 *;
 [Y]US3904137  (ANDERSON GILBERT E, et al) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *