Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715196

EP0715196 - Splice tray module for optical fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.01.2008  [2008/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CCS Technology, Inc.
103 Foulk Road
Wilmington, DE 19803 / US
[2002/04]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Finzel, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing.
Münchner Ring 2
D-85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
02 / Schmallegger, Hermann
Mühlhauserstr. 10
D-81379 München / DE
03 / Kreutz, Dieter
Geschwister-Scholl-Str. 15
D-82031 Grünwald / DE
04 / Schröder, Günter
Jeisstr. 26a
D-82140 Neuesting / DE
05 / Licker, Anton-Günther
Kafkastr. 27
D-81737 München / DE
[1996/23]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph
Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unter den Eichen 5
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing.
c/o Quermann & Richardt, Unter den Eichen 7
65195 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2001/43]Sturm, Christoph, Dipl.-Ing.
Corning Cable Systems GmbH & Co. KG, Patentabteilung, Kistlerhofstrasse 170
81379 München / DE
Application number, filing date95118634.527.11.1995
[1996/23]
Priority number, dateDE1994444282301.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4442823
[1996/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715196
Date:05.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715196
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44
[1996/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/23]
TitleGerman:Kassettenmodul für Lichtwellenleiter[1996/23]
English:Splice tray module for optical fibers[1996/23]
French:Module de cassettes pour fibres optiques[1996/23]
Examination procedure18.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
04.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2002Fee for grant paid
21.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
CH30.11.2002
LI30.11.2002
[2008/05]
Former [2003/40]NL25.09.2002
CH30.11.2002
LI30.11.2002
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2694642  (POUYET HENRI [FR]) [X] 1,3,11 * page 5; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO9423324  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * page 9 - page 13; figures 2,4,9-11 *;
 [A]WO9412904  (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,7 * page 8 - page 9; figures 4,6,19 *;
 [A]EP0215668  (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-5,12 * page 20, line 10 - page 23, line 3; figures 3,5,12 *;
 [PX]WO9507486  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [PX] 1,2,5 * page 9, line 3 - page 15, line 18; figures 1,2 *