Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0716838

EP0716838 - Prosthesis with articulating surface stress reducing contact edge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING TRUST I
61 First Street South Orange
New Jersey 07079 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]For all designated states
BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING TRUST I
61 First Street
South Orange, New Jersey 07079 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pappas, Michael J.
61 Gould Place
Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US
[1996/25]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date95118660.027.11.1995
[1996/25]
Priority number, dateUS1994034530228.11.1994         Original published format: US 345302
[1996/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0716838
Date:19.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0716838
Date:26.06.1996
[1996/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0716838
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/30, A61F2/38
[1996/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/25]
TitleGerman:Prothese mit einer Gelenkfläche, die eine Kontaktkante mit reduzierter Spannung aufweist[1996/25]
English:Prosthesis with articulating surface stress reducing contact edge[1996/25]
French:Prothèse comportant une surface d'articulation avec un bord de contact à contrainte réduite[1996/25]
Examination procedure27.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
15.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1999Fee for grant paid
11.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
GR02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
DK02.05.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2003/08]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
NL02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2002/26]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
ES02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/09]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
PT02.05.2000
SE02.05.2000
Former [2001/08]AT02.02.2000
BE02.02.2000
CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
Former [2000/52]CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
Former [2000/50]CH08.05.2000
LI08.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0302850  (MENSCHIK ALFRED) [Y] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [YA]US5152799  (LYONS MATTHEW [US]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 5; figure 1B * [A] 3,5,10;
 [A]EP0415761  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 33; figure - *;
 [A]US4586933  (SHOJI HIROMU [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 41 - line 45; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0600806  (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 5 *;
 [A]FR2634373  (LEBEGUEC PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0226762  (SULZER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * figure . *