Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0778106

EP0778106 - Repairing method with welding and build-up welding apparatus for metal member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Niinuma, Jun
4-27-3, Chiharadai Ichihara-shi
Chiba 290 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]For all designated states
Niinuma, Jun
4-27-3, Chiharadai
Ichihara-shi, Chiba 290 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date95119307.707.12.1995
[1997/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0778106
Date:11.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0778106
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:B23K11/00, B23K9/04
[1997/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1997/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Instandsetzen durch Schweissung und Auftragschweissgerät für Metallbauteil[1997/24]
English:Repairing method with welding and build-up welding apparatus for metal member[1997/24]
French:Méthode de réparation par soudage et appareil de rechargement par soudage pour structure métallique[1997/24]
Examination procedure16.09.1997Examination requested  [1997/46]
23.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.1999Fee for grant paid
29.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001   
Sanwa Shoko Co., Ltd.
1-54-11 Sasazuka, Shibuya-ku
JP- Tokyo 151-0073 / JP
Opponent's representative
Butenschön, Antje
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2001/11]
Opponent(s)01  11.01.2001   
Sanwa Shoko Co., Ltd.
1-54-11 Sasazuka, Shibuya-ku
JP- Tokyo 151-0073 / JP
Opponent's representative
Butenschön, Antje, Dr.
Patentanwälte PFENNING, MEINIG & PARTNER Kurfürstendamm 170
10707 Berlin / DE
16.02.2001Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.10.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.11.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
15.11.2001Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB07.12.2000
ES09.12.2000
[2004/38]
Former [2002/15]GB07.12.2000
Documents cited:Search[YDA]US5378867  (NIINUMA JUN [JP]) [YD] 1 * column A; figures 4A,4B * [A] 2-5;
 [YA]EP0454073  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 2-5