Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0717093

EP0717093 - Liquid crystal compositions and liquid crystal display elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chisso Corporation
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]For all designated states
CHISSO CORPORATION
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sawada, Shinichi
316-1, Saihiro
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Nakagawa, Etsuo
8890, Goi
Ichihara-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
[1996/25]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/25]Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date95119355.608.12.1995
[1996/25]
Priority number, dateJP1994033204612.12.1994         Original published format: JP 33204694
[1996/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0717093
Date:19.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0717093
Date:26.06.1996
[1996/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0717093
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:C09K19/42, C09K19/44, C09K19/46
[1996/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/25]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallzusammensetzungen und Flüssigkristallanzeigeelemente[1996/25]
English:Liquid crystal compositions and liquid crystal display elements[1996/25]
French:Compositions cristallines liquides et élément d'affichage à cristaux liquides[1996/25]
Examination procedure10.08.1996Examination requested  [1996/41]
21.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.11.1999Fee for grant paid
25.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9119772  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 15 * * example 8 *;
 [DA]EP0325796  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * use examples 8 9 12-15 *;
 [A]EP0411511  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,7 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0481293  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,7 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0282300  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,7 * tables I,II *;
 [PA]EP0681022  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,3,7 * the whole document *