Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0731574 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0731574



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1577
29.01.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.02.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.02.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
29.01.2008 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
29.01.2008 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 1
07.01.2008 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
02.01.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.01.2008 Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision Search / examination 3
02.01.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
11.05.2007 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 31
12.03.2007 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
08.02.2007 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
13.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.11.2006 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2006 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 10
07.11.2006 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.09.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.08.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.06.2006 Claims Appeal 14
19.06.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 16
19.06.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
03.05.2006 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
28.04.2006 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
28.04.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 12
28.04.2006 Means of redress Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Annex to a communication Search / examination 22
20.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
20.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
20.04.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
03.04.2006 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.03.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.02.2006 Description Search / examination 3
10.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
09.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
02.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 1
02.02.2006 Description Search / examination 3
02.02.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 4
28.10.2005 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
26.10.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
24.10.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
24.10.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.10.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.09.2004 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.09.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
10.09.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.06.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
07.06.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.03.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 20
16.10.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 9
15.09.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 29
15.09.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 145
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 165
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 38
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 56
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 214
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 136
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 191
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 62
15.09.2003 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
23.08.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
29.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
29.07.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.07.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 42
21.07.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.06.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
11.01.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
12.12.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
12.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.12.2001 Authorisation Appeal 1
06.12.2001 Claims Appeal 9
06.12.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
09.04.2001 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
20.02.2001 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
01.02.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.02.2001 Authorisation Appeal 1
01.02.2001 Notice of appeal Appeal 9
18.12.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.12.2000 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 12
14.12.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 4
06.11.2000 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 4
03.05.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.04.2000 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
29.03.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.12.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.1999 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Description Search / examination 1
29.09.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
29.09.1999 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.07.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 22
22.07.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
16.06.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.06.1998 European search report Search / examination 2
01.05.1998 General enquiry Search / examination 2
09.03.1998 General enquiry Search / examination 1
18.03.1996 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.1996 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
05.03.1996 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.01.1996 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.01.1996 Priority document Search / examination 17
08.12.1995 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.12.1995 Claims Search / examination 2
08.12.1995 Description Search / examination 9
08.12.1995 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.12.1995 Drawings Search / examination 4
08.12.1995 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6