Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718569

EP0718569 - Thermostatic expansion valve [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujikoki Mfg. Co., Ltd.
7-17-24 Todoroki, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1996/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Kazuhiko
c/o Fujikoki Mfg. Co., Ltd., 7-17-24 Todoroki
Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Watanabe, Chiharu
c/o Tokai Kiki K.K., 3-55 Akemi-cho
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date95119999.118.12.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateJP1994032074222.12.1994         Original published format: JP 32074294
JP1995016600130.06.1995         Original published format: JP 16600195
[1996/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0718569
Date:26.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718569
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1996
ClassificationInternational:F25B41/06, B21K1/20
[1996/26]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Thermostatisches Expansionsventil[1996/26]
English:Thermostatic expansion valve[1996/26]
French:Vanne de détente thermostatique[1996/26]
Examination procedure21.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/35]
09.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.1999Fee for grant paid
15.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99115137.4  / EP0962727
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5303864  (HIROTA HISATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,4,5;
 [A]GB930725  (GACHOT JEAN) [A] 1,4-6