Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0718749

EP0718749 - Method, system components, and program module for selection of a search criteria [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.04.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue La Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
[2000/25]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
ALCATEL
54, rue de la Boétie
75008 Paris / FR
Former [1996/26]For all designated states
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft
Lorenzstrasse 10
D-70435 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hackbarth, Heidi, Dr.
Tubizer Strasse 54
D-70825 Korntal / DE
02 / Ohnsorge, Horst, Prof.
Zellerstrasse 4
D-71691 Freiberg / DE
03 / Garcia-Victoria, Carlos
Mergentheimer Weg 9
D-71732 Tamm / DE
04 / Stannard, Richard
Bei der Eiche 14
D-70435 Stuttgart / DE
[1996/26]
Representative(s)Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel Lucent
Intellectual Property & Standards
70430 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/26]Brose, Gerhard , et al
Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29
70449 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date95120275.321.12.1995
[1996/26]
Priority number, dateDE1994444561721.12.1994         Original published format: DE 4445617
[1996/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0718749
Date:26.06.1996
Language:DE
[1996/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0718749
Date:02.10.1996
[1996/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0718749
Date:21.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP16.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173, G06F17/30, G06F3/033, G06F3/023
[1996/39]
Former International [1996/26]G06F3/033, G06F3/023
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1996/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren, Systemkomponente und Programm-Modul zur Auswahl eines Suchbegriffs[1996/26]
English:Method, system components, and program module for selection of a search criteria[1996/26]
French:Procédé, composants de système et module de programme pour sélectionner un critère de recherche[1996/26]
Examination procedure19.12.1996Examination requested  [1997/09]
01.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2000Fee for grant paid
24.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL21.06.2000
AT21.12.2000
GB21.12.2000
SE22.12.2000
BE31.12.2000
CH31.12.2000
LI31.12.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2003/08]NL21.06.2000
GB21.12.2000
SE22.12.2000
BE31.12.2000
CH31.12.2000
LI31.12.2000
Former [2002/15]GB21.12.2000
SE22.12.2000
BE31.12.2000
CH31.12.2000
LI31.12.2000
Former [2002/05]SE22.12.2000
BE31.12.2000
Former [2002/03]BE31.12.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]US4768144  (WINTER PETER M [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 21 * * column 17, line 63 - column 18, line 68 * * column 20, line 51 - column 23, line 43; figure 3B *;
 [A]GB2187580  (MULTI NET PTY LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, column L, line 43 - column R, line 2 * * page 3, column L, line 24 - column R, line 87; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]JPH02101578  ;
 [A]WO9311640  (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 5 * abstract * * page 36, line 11 - page 37, line 11; figures 14-15C *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900705), vol. 014, no. 313, Database accession no. (P - 1072), [A] 1-7 * abstract *