Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0781992

EP0781992 - Fluorescence X-ray analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2007  [2007/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HORIBA, LTD.
2 Miyanohigashi-machi Kissyoin Minami-ku
Kyoto / JP
[2006/23]
Former [1997/27]For all designated states
HORIBA, LTD.
2 Miyanohigashi-machi Kissyoin
Minami-ku Kyoto / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ozawa, Sumito
c/o Horiba, Ltd., 2 Miyanohigashi-machi, Kissyoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto / JP
02 / Hosokawa, Yoshinori
c/o Horiba, Ltd., 2 Miyanohigashi-machi, Kissyoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto / JP
03 / Kashihara, Kozo
c/o Horiba, Ltd., 2 Miyanohigashi-machi, Kissyoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto / JP
04 / Setou, Gensiro
c/o Horiba, Ltd., 2 Miyanohigashi-machi, Kissyoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto / JP
[1997/27]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E. , et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/27]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date95120285.221.12.1995
[1997/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0781992
Date:02.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0781992
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1996
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/223, G01N23/20
[1997/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1997/27]
TitleGerman:Röntgenfluoreszenzanalysegerät[1997/27]
English:Fluorescence X-ray analyzer[1997/27]
French:Appareil d'analyse de fluorescence à rayons X[2006/03]
Former [1997/27]Appareil d'analyse de fluorecence à rayons X
Examination procedure19.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/27]
01.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2006Fee for grant paid
29.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
24.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
20.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
22.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 09
29.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 10
21.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US3889113  (RHODES JOHN R) [A] 1,3,8 * column 4, line 40 - line 54 * * column 5, line 21 - line 29 * * column 5, line 42 - line 55 * * figure 1; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4130556  (PICOLAB OBERFLAECHEN UND SPURE) [A] 1,2 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]  - RHODES, "ENERGY-DISPERSIVE X-RAY SPECTROMETRY FOR MULTIELEMENT POLLUTION ANALYSIS", INTERNATIONAL LABORATORY, (1973), pages 21 - 32, XP002002950 [A] 1,3 * page 23, column R, paragraph 2; figure 3 *
ExaminationGB2121168