Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0720980

EP0720980 - Process for the preparation of 4-hydroxyanilides of alkylcarboxylic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[1996/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Lantzsch, Reinhard, Dr.
am Buschhäuschen 51
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Rivadeneira, Eric, Dr.
Blankenburg 28
D-51381 Leverkusen / DE
03 / Lindner, Werner, Dr.
Märchenstr. 39
D-51067 Köln / DE
[1996/28]
Application number, filing date95120370.222.12.1995
[1996/28]
Priority number, dateDE199510011904.01.1995         Original published format: DE 19500119
[1996/28]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0720980
Date:10.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0720980
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.03.1996
ClassificationInternational:C07C231/02, C07C233/24, C07C233/60
[1996/28]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/28]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkylcarbonsäure-4-Hydroxyaniliden[1996/28]
English:Process for the preparation of 4-hydroxyanilides of alkylcarboxylic acid[1996/28]
French:Procédé pour la préparation de 4-hydroxyanilides d'acide alkylcarboxylique[1996/28]
Examination procedure29.11.1996Examination requested  [1997/04]
27.10.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.1999Fee for grant paid
09.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0569792  (BAYER AG [DE]) [XD] 1-4 * column W *;
 [XD]EP0339418  (BAYER AG [DE]) [XD] 1-4 * example 1; claims 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0608739  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-3 *
 [A]  - F. MÖLLER, HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der organischen Chemie, Band XI/2, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, [A] 1 * Seite 10 - Seite 14 ; Seite 13, Absatz 8 *
 [A]  - ISEITLIN, G. M. ET AL., "Acylation in amide solvents", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19800310), vol. 92, no. 10, Database accession no. 76952g, [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - IZV. VYSSH. UCHEBN. ZAVED., KHIM. KHIM. TEKHNOL., vol. 22, no. 10, pages 1190 - 1193,
 [A]  - IVANOVA, N. S. ET AL., "Reactivity of hydroxyl group of aminophenols in reactions with benzoyl chloride in nonaqueous solutions.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19780925), vol. 89, no. 13, Database accession no. 107264d, [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - IZV. VYSSH. UCHEBN. ZAVED., KHIM. KHIM. TEKHNOL., vol. 21, no. 4, pages 529 - 533,
ExaminationGB1255161
by applicantEP0339418
 EP0569792
 US3674831
    - Houben-Weyl, vol. E5, page 972,
    - Houben-Weyl, vol. E5, page 543,
    - CESARE FERRI, Reaktionen in der organischen Synthese, (1978),
    - DIVERSI ET AL., Synthesis, (1971), page 258,
    - CESARE FERRI, Reaktionen in der organischen Synthese, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1978), pages 460 - 461,