blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0703415

EP0703415 - Front panel for panel-type radiator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.1999
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.1999 [1999/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ULAMO BEHEER B.V.
Bongersstraat 7
7071 CM Ulft / NL
[1998/28]
Former [1996/23]For all designated states
ULAMO BEHEER B.V.
Bongersstraat 7
7071 CM Ulft / NL
Former [1996/13]For all designated states
ULAMO BEHEER B.V.
Bongersstraat 7
NL-7071 CM Delft / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ten Brincke, Hendrikus Gerardus Bernardus Maria
Gentiaan 16
NL-7081 GJ Gendringen / NL
[1996/13]
Representative(s)Ackmann, Günther, et al
Ackmann Menges Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31
80454 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/13]Ackmann, Günther, et al
ACKMANN & MENGES Patentanwälte Postfach 10 01 01
D-47001 Duisburg / DE
Application number, filing date95200585.810.03.1995
[1996/13]
Priority number, dateDE19940015520U24.09.1994         Original published format: DE 9415520 U
[1996/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0703415
Date:27.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0703415
Date:08.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.1996
ClassificationIPC:F24D19/06
[1996/13]
CPC:
F24D19/06 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/13]
TitleGerman:Frontverkleidung für Plattenheizkörper[1996/13]
English:Front panel for panel-type radiator[1996/13]
French:Revêtement frontal pour radiateur à plaques[1996/13]
Examination procedure15.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/13]
15.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.01.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.1998Fee for grant paid
10.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.04.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4023548  (ULAMO BEHEER BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]DE9312820U  (NORTHOR A S HERLEV [DK]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]DE2301089  (PRODUCTION TOOLS OXFORD LTD) [A] 1 * page 7, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]DE3319787  (ERBSLOEH JULIUS & AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.