Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0674968 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0674968



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 184
13.01.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
20.06.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.06.2007 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
15.06.2007 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
05.06.2007 French translation of claims Opposition 2
05.06.2007 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
05.06.2007 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.03.2007 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
07.03.2007 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
07.03.2007 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
26.02.2007 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
24.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.11.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 5
14.11.2006 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.11.2006 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2006 Text intended for grant Opposition 10
30.10.2006 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
03.05.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.04.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
28.04.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.04.2006 Fax filed during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
15.03.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.02.2006 Annex to a communication Opposition 10
16.02.2006 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
16.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
13.12.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.12.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
06.12.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.12.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.10.2005 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
27.10.2005 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
27.10.2005 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
18.03.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 30
04.02.2005 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
25.01.2005 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 5
30.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
28.12.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
21.12.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
31.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
24.08.2004 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 7
21.08.2004 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.08.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
10.08.2004 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
22.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1