Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0683536

EP0683536 - Coolant plate assembly for a fuel cell stack [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERNATIONAL FUEL CELLS CORPORATION
195 Governor's Highway P.O. Box 139
South Windsor, CT 06074 / US
For all designated states
CLC S.r.l.
Piazza Carignano 2
I-16128 Genova / IT
[1995/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Breault, Richard D.
673 Brigham Tavern Road
Coventry, CT 06238 / US
02 / Martin, Ronald G.
West Hill Road
Monson, MA 01057 / US
03 / Roche, Robert P.
269 Redwood Lane
Cheshire, CT 06410 / US
04 / Scheffler, Glenn W.
7 Willie Circle
Tolland, CT 06084 / US
05 / O'Brien, Joseph J.
329 South Main Street
Marlborough, CT 06447 / US
06 / Rajpolt, Michael J., Jr.
Walnut Drive
Marlborough, CT 06447 / US
[1995/47]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/47]Perani, Aurelio , et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95201280.516.05.1995
[1995/47]
Priority number, dateUS1994024658120.05.1994         Original published format: US 246581
[1995/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0683536
Date:22.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0683536
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, F28F21/02
[1995/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
Former [1995/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesLTNot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kühlplattenzusammenbau für einen Brennstoffzellenstapel[2000/02]
English:Coolant plate assembly for a fuel cell stack[1995/47]
French:Assemblage de plaque de refroidissement pour une pile de cellules à combustible[1995/47]
Former [1995/47]Kühlplattenzusammenbau für ein Brennstoffzellenstapel
Examination procedure19.03.1996Examination requested  [1996/22]
19.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.08.1999Fee for grant paid
27.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
09.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199905   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
DK19.04.2000
PT19.04.2000
[2003/45]
Former [2003/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2002/23]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
PT19.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT19.01.2000
BE19.01.2000
CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH19.01.2000
LI19.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH25.04.2000
LI25.04.2000
Documents cited:SearchJPS6324562  [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP);
 [X]DE3903261  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 11,13 * column 4, line 6 - line 40; figure 1 * * column 4, line 55 - line 61 * * column 5, line 17 - line 23 *;
 [A]JPH01169877  ;
 [A]JPS61140070  ;
 [A]JPS6398963  ;
 [A]JPS62229766  ;
 [A]JPS58166663  ;
 [A]US4233369  (BREAULT RICHARD D, et al) [A] 11 * column 4, line 57 - line 63 * * column 5, line 40 - line 59 * * column 4, line 1 - line 5 *;
 [A]JPS58117654  ;
 [A]GB2151840  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [A] 4 * figure 3 *
 [A]  - NAKAYAMA TAESUKE ET AL, "Cooling plates for fuel cells", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880530), vol. 108, no. 22, Database accession no. 189920, [A] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891005), vol. 013, no. 444, Database accession no. (E - 828), [A] 11,13 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861114), vol. 010, no. 337, Database accession no. (E - 454), [A] 6 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880912), vol. 012, no. 337, Database accession no. (E - 657), [A] 11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880331), vol. 012, no. 099, Database accession no. (E - 594), [A] 11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831227), vol. 007, no. 292, Database accession no. (E - 219), [A] 11 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831007), vol. 007, no. 226, Database accession no. (E - 202), [A] 7 * abstract *