blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0685171

EP0685171 - Bake-stable custard [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2009Change: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CSM Nederland B.V.
Nienoord 13
1112 XE Diemen / NL
[2001/41]
Former [1995/49]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  PT  SE  AT 
UNILEVER N.V.
P.O. Box 760
NL-3000 DK Rotterdam / NL
For:GB  IE 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Hameleers-v. Bilsen, Danielle G.J.L.
Arthur van Schendelstraat 647
NL-3511 MZ Utrecht / NL
02 / Scholtes, Jacobus L.H.
Prins Mauritssingel 82C
NL-3043 PJ Rotterdam / NL
03 / van Zon, Maria J.A.
Van Halenstraat 8
NL-3255 BN Oude Tonge / NL
[1995/49]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2001/35]Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [1995/49]Sikken, Antonius H. J. M., et al
UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137
NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date95201387.826.05.1995
[1995/49]
Priority number, dateEP1994020153531.05.1994         Original published format: EP 94201535
[1995/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0685171
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0685171
Date:03.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.09.1995
ClassificationIPC:A23L1/187, A23C9/154
[1995/49]
CPC:
A23C9/1544 (EP); A23L9/12 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/49]
TitleGerman:Bakenstabile Custard[1995/49]
English:Bake-stable custard[1995/49]
French:Flan stable à la cuisson[1995/49]
Examination procedure11.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/11]
24.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2001Fee for grant paid
11.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.01.2003  21.01.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
P. Stuyvesantweg 1
8937 AC Leeuwarden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2003/09]
Opponent(s)01  03.01.2003   
Friesland Brands B.V.
P. Stuyvesantweg 1
8937 AC Leeuwarden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
07.02.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.06.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
24.11.2005Date of oral proceedings
31.01.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.01.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
11.09.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/38]
Appeal following opposition24.03.2006Appeal received No.  T0447/06
09.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
11.09.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
11.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
19.09.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
31.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR1574091  (CORN PRODUCTS CO.) [X] 1-9 * examples 5,8,9 * * page 9, line 38 - page 10, line 3 * * page 22, paragraph 4 - page 23, line 33 * [Y] 10;
 [Y]US3666497  (STEWART AUBREY P JR, et al) [Y] 10 * claim 1 * * column 1, line 56 - line 62 * * column 2, line 34 - line 48 ** example 4 *;
 [X]GB2261805  (GEN FOODS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-3,5,7,9 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 4 - line 21 * * page 8, paragraph 3 * * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9404037  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 16 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [A]  - H.D.GRAHAM:, Food Colloïds, WESTPORT - USA, AVI, XP008063144 [A] 1,5,7 * Pages 355-357, 360, 361 * * page 356, paragraph 2 - page 357, paragraph 2 * * page 360, paragraph 3 - page 361, paragraph 3 *
by applicantWO9404036
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.