Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0686594

EP0686594 - Self load bearing lift system and arrangement for mounting the main motor thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Loiodice, Aldo
132, Residenza Faggi, Via Verdi
20080 Basiglio / IT
[1999/24]
Former [1995/50]For all designated states
Loiodice, Aldo
6, Via Latisana
I-20159 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Riccardi, Sergio
Riccardi & Co.
Via Macedonio Melloni, 32
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Riccardi, Sergio
Riccardi & Co. Via Macedonio Melloni, 32
I-20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date95201469.403.06.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateIT1994MI0120509.06.1994         Original published format: IT MI941205
IT1994MI0237924.11.1994         Original published format: IT MI942379
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0686594
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0686594
Date:20.11.1996
[1996/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0686594
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.1996
ClassificationInternational:B66B7/02, B66B11/00
[1995/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Selbsttragendes Aufzugsystem und Einbaueinrichtung für dessen Hauptmotor[1995/50]
English:Self load bearing lift system and arrangement for mounting the main motor thereof[1995/50]
French:Système d'ascenseur auto-portant et dispositif pour y fixer le moteur principal[1995/50]
Examination procedure22.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/34]
06.06.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
14.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
31.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2000Fee for grant paid
01.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99200645.2  / EP0933324
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.07.1997M01   Fee paid on   26.07.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
FR17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
LU03.06.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/35]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
FR17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
Former [2004/07]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
GR17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2003/45]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
DK17.08.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2003/08]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
NL17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2002/42]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
MC17.07.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2002/02]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
CH17.05.2000
LI17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/50]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
IE05.06.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/28]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
GB17.08.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/27]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
PT17.08.2000
SE17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/24]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
PT17.08.2000
FR13.10.2000
Former [2001/16]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
PT17.08.2000
Former [2001/11]AT17.05.2000
BE17.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE3922798  (SCHLOSSER) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 17 * * figure - * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP0442230  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [YA]DE9302119U  (C. HAUSHAHN GMBH) [Y] 5 * figure -; claims 1,13 * [A] 1,4;
 [A]US4793441  (CILDERMAN JANIS [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH01261188  ;
 [A]CH615138  (VILLARS JULIO [CH]) [A] 6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900116), vol. 014, no. 019, Database accession no. (M - 919), [A] 6 * abstract *