Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0751430

EP0751430 - Apparatus and method for making a lithographic printing plate by silver salt diffusion transfer processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2002  [2002/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert N.V.
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[N/P]
Former [1997/01]For all designated states
AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Vanooteghem, Luc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800
Septestraat 27
B 2640 Mortsel / BE
02 / Bertels, Alfons c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
[1997/01]
Application number, filing date95201778.829.06.1995
[1997/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0751430
Date:02.01.1997
Language:EN
[1997/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:G03D3/13, G03D3/04, G03F7/07
[1997/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1997/01]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer lithographischen Druckplatte nach dem Silbersalz-Diffusionsübertragungsverfahren[1997/01]
English:Apparatus and method for making a lithographic printing plate by silver salt diffusion transfer processing[1997/01]
French:Dispositif et méthode de fabrication d'une plaque d'impression lithographique selon le procédé de diffusion-transfert de sel d'argent[1997/01]
Examination procedure02.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/36]
21.11.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DA]EP0623854  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [DA] 1,2,14 * column 1 - column 3, line 16 * * column 7, line 8 - line 39 * * figure - *;
 [A]US5043756  (TAKABAYASHI NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,14 * column 21, line 63 - column 22, line 15; figures 23,24 *;
 [A]US4324354  (HOPE HENRY F, et al) [A] 1,2,14 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 28; figures 2,3 *;
 [DA]EP0423399  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [DA] 1,2,14 * claim 1 *
by applicantUS2352014
 DE2346378
 EP0410500
 EP0483415
 EP0423399
 EP0450199
 EP0502562
 EP0491457
 EP0503602
 EP0471483
 DE4102173
 US4501811
 US4784933
    A. ROTT, E. WEYDE, Photographic Silver Halide Diffusion Processes, LONDON, NEW YORK, THE FOCAL PRESS,
 EP19930201305
 US19940303670
 EP19930202862