Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0693295

EP0693295 - Suction catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORDIS EUROPA N.V.
Oosteinde 8
NL-9301 LJ Roden / NL
[1996/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Bosma, Gjalt
Oudeweg 97
NL-9201 EK Drachten / NL
02 / Boudewijn, Alexander Christiaan
Oldenoert 124
NL-9351 KS Leek / NL
[1996/04]
Representative(s)'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [1996/04]'t Jong, Bastiaan Jacobus , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date95201873.707.07.1995
[1996/04]
Priority number, dateNL1994000118419.07.1994         Original published format: NL 9401184
[1996/04]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0693295
Date:24.01.1996
[1996/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0693295
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.1995
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[1996/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/04]
TitleGerman:Absaugkatheter[1996/04]
English:Suction catheter[1996/04]
French:Catheter d'aspiration[1996/04]
Examination procedure11.07.1996Examination requested  [1996/36]
22.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.04.2002Fee for grant paid
15.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/06]
Former [2007/16]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2006/14]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/39]AT25.09.2002
CH25.09.2002
LI25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/31]AT25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/29]SE25.12.2002
PT26.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0442579  (CORDIS EUROP [NL]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2;
 [XA]US5300022  (KLAPPER MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 55; figures 2,5,6 * [A] 3,5;
 [YA]WO9105575  (BAXTER INT [US]) [Y] 2 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 29; figures 1,2 * [A] 5;
 [A]US4637814  (LEIBOFF ARNOLD [US]) [A] 3 * column A; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5078688  (LOBODZINSKI RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 4 * column A; figure 1 *