Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0684689

EP0684689 - Method and device for controlling speed of a washing machine motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku
Seoul / KR
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku
Seoul / KR
Former [1996/06]For all designated states
LG ELECTRONICS INC.
20, Yoido-Dong,Yongdungpo-Gu
Seoul / KR
Former [1995/48]For all designated states
GOLDSTAR CO. Ltd.
20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku
Seoul / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Cheong, Dal Ho
Hongik Villa 102, 86-18 Sangsoo-Dong
Mapo-ku, Seoul / KR
02 / Sang, Doo Whan
1480-1 Socho 3-Dong
Socho-ku, Seoul / KR
[1995/48]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/48]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date95202299.416.11.1994
[1995/48]
Priority number, dateKR1993002406516.11.1993         Original published format: KR 9324065
KR1994000106820.01.1994         Original published format: KR 9401068
KR1994000636529.03.1994         Original published format: KR 9406365
KR1994001067816.05.1994         Original published format: KR 9410678
KR1994001085317.05.1994         Original published format: KR 9410853
[1995/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0684689
Date:29.11.1995
Language:EN
[1995/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0684689
Date:07.02.1996
[1996/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0684689
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.1995
ClassificationInternational:H02P5/402, D06F33/02
[1995/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Regeln der Drehzahl eines Waschmaschinenmotors[1996/05]
English:Method and device for controlling speed of a washing machine motor[1995/48]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour commander la vitesse du moteur d'une machine à laver[1996/05]
Former [1995/48]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Drehzahlsteuerung eines Waschmaschinenmotors
Former [1995/48]Méthode et dispositif de commande de vitesse pour moteur de machine à laver
Examination procedure12.06.1996Examination requested  [1996/32]
19.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.1999Fee for grant paid
06.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94308465.7  / EP0653832
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
01.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
07.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0653832  (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [XP] 1-16;
 [Y]US4972134  (GETZ EDWARD H [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,8;
 [Y]US5130624  (BASHARK LARRY T [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,8