EP0709394 - Steroids with a 17-spiromethylene lactone or lactol group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2001/05] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamersma, Johannes Antonius Maria Heischeutstraat 237 NL-5345 VZ Oss / NL | 02 /
van der Louw, Jaap Pauwoog 12 NL-5345 EN Oss / NL | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Hermans, Frans G.M., et al Patent Department N.V. Organon P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | ||
Former [1996/18] | Beetz, Tom, et al N.V. Organon, Postbus 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 95202865.2 | 24.10.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | EP19940203117 | 27.10.1994 Original published format: EP 94203117 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709394 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709394 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0709394 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07J21/00, C07J41/00, A61K31/58, // C07J51/00, C07J9/00, C07J17/00, C07J31/00 | [1996/18] | CPC: |
C07J21/006 (EP,US);
C07J19/00 (KR);
A61P15/18 (EP);
C07J1/0092 (EP,US);
C07J17/00 (EP,US);
C07J21/003 (EP,US);
C07J31/006 (EP,US);
C07J41/0016 (EP,US);
C07J51/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/18] | Title | German: | Steroid-Verbindungen mit einer 17-Spiromethylen-Lakton- oder Lactol-Gruppe | [1996/18] | English: | Steroids with a 17-spiromethylene lactone or lactol group | [1996/18] | French: | Stéroides avec un groupement 17-spirométhylène lactone ou lactol | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/18] | 06.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 01.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/04] | Request for further processing for: | 28.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 31.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2875199 (CELLA JOHN A) [A] 1,5-10* the whole document *; | [A]US3657226 (LEFEBVRE YVON) [A] 1,5-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0321010 (AKZO NV [NL]) [A] 1,5-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0558416 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [DA] 1,5-10 * the whole document * |