Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0726201

EP0726201 - Cable for detecting a misalignment of adjacent airfoils [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
7755 E. Marginal Way South
M.S. 13-08
Seattle
Washington 98108 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/33]For all designated states
THE BOEING COMPANY
7755 E. Marginal Way South, M.S. 13-08
Seattle, Washington 98108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Caferro, Joseph S.
435 South Pacific Coast Highway No. 104
Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US
02 / Tomassi, Hector V.
1425 So. Puget Drive 314
Renton, Washington 98055 / US
[1996/33]
Representative(s)Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [1996/33]Bartelds, Erik
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date95202998.106.11.1995
[1996/33]
Priority number, dateUS1995038764813.02.1995         Original published format: US 387648
[1996/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0726201
Date:14.08.1996
Language:EN
[1996/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0726201
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.1996
ClassificationInternational:B64D45/00, B64C9/02
[1996/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/33]
TitleGerman:Kabel zur Ueberwachung des Schiefstandes von benachbarten Tragflächen[1996/33]
English:Cable for detecting a misalignment of adjacent airfoils[1996/33]
French:Cable de détection de désalignement de surfaces portantes adjacentes[1996/33]
Examination procedure15.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/11]
22.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.1999Fee for grant paid
17.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.199703   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.1997
Documents cited:Search[YA]FR684487  (LEFEVRE) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 19 * [A] 2;
 [Y]US4483498  (BOEHRINGER WILFRED E [US]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 *;
 [A]EP0084396  (FOKKER BV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 15 - line 24 *;
 [DA]US4181276  (KOGURE YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3935754
 US4181276