Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0715986

EP0715986 - Loading device for vehicles and vehicles equipped with it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RAYMAEKERS & KAAG, afgekort "R & K", besloten vennootschap met beperkte aansprakelijkheid
Oudstrijdersstraat 32
3020 Herent / BE
[1996/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Raymaekers, Yvan
Oud Strijderstraat 32
3020 Herent / BE
02 / Kaag, Michael
Leuvensesteenweg 456
3071 Kortenberg / BE
[1996/24]
Representative(s)Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv.
Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
[N/P]
Former [1996/24]Donné, Eddy , et al
Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13
2000 Antwerpen / BE
Application number, filing date95203355.306.12.1995
[1996/24]
Priority number, dateBE1994000110806.12.1994         Original published format: BE 9401108
[1996/24]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0715986
Date:12.06.1996
Language:EN
[1996/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0715986
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.02.1996
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/44
[1996/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1996/24]
TitleGerman:Ladevorrichtung für Fahrzeuge und Fahrzeuge versehen mit derselben[1996/24]
English:Loading device for vehicles and vehicles equipped with it[1996/24]
French:Dispositif de chargement d'un véhicule et véhicule équipé de ce dispositif[1996/24]
Examination procedure27.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/21]
24.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.12.1999Fee for grant paid
31.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
27.01.1997M01   Fee paid on   27.02.1997
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB06.12.2000
[2002/15]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4083429  (ABBOTT JOHN D) [X] 1-7,13 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-5,7 *;
 [X]EP0140742  (GATEAU EUGENE) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 29 - page 5, line 25; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4239440  (JAMES LARRY R [US]) [X] 1-5,7,13 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 54; figure - *;
 [PX]WO9427546  (RICON CORP [US]) [PX] 8 * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 7; figures 1-4 *