Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0709598

EP0709598 - Overriding ratio matching feature in power shift transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road Basildon
Essex SS14 3AD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/18]For all designated states
NEW HOLLAND U.K. LIMITED
Cranes Farm Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3AD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Bulgrien, Garth H.
2 Briar Wood Lane
Epharata, PA 17522 / US
[1996/18]
Representative(s)Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
8210 Zedelgem / BE
[N/P]
Former [1996/18]Vandenbroucke, Alberic , et al
New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A
B-8210 Zedelgem / BE
Application number, filing date95203371.028.11.1990
[1996/18]
Priority number, dateUS1989044431201.12.1989         Original published format: US 444312
US1990050157329.03.1990         Original published format: US 501573
US1990052162910.05.1990         Original published format: US 521629
US1990052163010.05.1990         Original published format: US 521630
US1990052179910.05.1990         Original published format: US 521799
US1990052180810.05.1990         Original published format: US 521808
US1990052615721.05.1990         Original published format: US 526157
[1996/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0709598
Date:01.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0709598
Date:12.11.1997
[1997/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0709598
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16H61/02, // F16H59:08, F16H59:46
[1997/46]
Former International [1996/18]F16H61/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/18]
TitleGerman:Ausschaltkriterium für Gangauswahl in Lastschaltgetrieben[1996/18]
English:Overriding ratio matching feature in power shift transmissions[1996/18]
French:Caractéristique prioritaire de sélection de rapports dans un transmission à changement de rapports sous charge[1996/18]
Examination procedure06.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/27]
23.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP90203141.8  / EP0431677
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 06
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 07
18.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 08
24.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8605449  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [PX]EP0353310  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]WO8907057  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2;
 [X]US4561055  (MCKEE KEVIN D [US]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2,6; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]US4079638  (SIBEUD JEAN-PAUL) [A] 1 * the whole document *