blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0701316 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP92308770 EP93303296 EP93308203 EP95300183



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH06328327Global Dossier 29.11.1994A
Priority number Date
US2450393 01.03.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JPH06173909Global Dossier 21.06.1994A
Priority number Date
US93098692 17.08.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3107949BGlobal Dossier 13.11.2000B2
JPH06260332 16.09.1994A
Priority number Date
US99689392 28.12.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0614265Global Dossier 07.01.1998B1
EP0614265 18.01.1995A3
EP0614265 07.09.1994A2
Priority number Date
US2450393 01.03.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0583864Global Dossier 23.02.1994A1
Priority number Date
US93098692 17.08.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0534786Global Dossier 07.02.1996B1
EP0534786 31.03.1993A1
Priority number Date
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2140326 11.08.1998C
CA2140326 23.10.1995A1
Priority number Date
US23170394 22.04.1994
US30423594 12.09.1994
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69208190D 21.03.1996D1
Priority number Date
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69208190T 20.06.1996T2
Priority number Date
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69316188D 12.02.1998D1
Priority number Date
US2450393 01.03.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69316188T 07.05.1998T2
Priority number Date
US2450393 01.03.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5175456 29.12.1992A
Priority number Date
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5270625 14.12.1993A
Priority number Date
US93098692 17.08.1992
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5310064 10.05.1994A
Priority number Date
US76513091 25.09.1991
US84357592 28.02.1992
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5315189 24.05.1994A
Priority number Date
US99689392 28.12.1992
US76513091 25.09.1991
US2450393 01.03.1993
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5317222 31.05.1994A
Priority number Date
US99689392 28.12.1992
US76513091 25.09.1991
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5446323 29.08.1995A
Priority number Date
US99689392 28.12.1992
US76513091 25.09.1991
US23170394 22.04.1994
US2450393 01.03.1993
US30423594 12.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JPH08206932Global Dossier 13.08.1996A
Priority number Date
US30423594 12.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0701316Global Dossier 10.05.2000B1
EP0701316 23.04.1997A3
EP0701316 13.03.1996A2
Priority number Date
US30423594 12.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516778D 15.06.2000D1
Priority number Date
US30423594 12.09.1994
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69516778T 23.11.2000T2
Priority number Date
US30423594 12.09.1994