Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0701316

EP0701316 - Improved actuator with translational and rotational control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 26.06.2002  [2002/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSTEMS, MACHINES, AUTOMATION COMPONENTS CORPORATION
5807 Van Allen Way Carlsbad
California 92008 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/11]For all designated states
SYSTEMS, MACHINES, AUTOMATION COMPONENTS CORPORATION
5807 Van Allen Way
Carlsbad, California 92008 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Neff, Edward A.
16535 El Camino Real
Rancho Santa Fe, California 92067 / US
02 / Moss, John
5955 North Walnut
San Bernardino, California 92507 / US
[1996/11]
Representative(s)Coxon, Philip , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1996/11]Coxon, Philip , et al
Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate
Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB
Application number, filing date95300183.112.01.1995
[1996/11]
Priority number, dateUS1994030423512.09.1994         Original published format: US 304235
[1996/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0701316
Date:13.03.1996
Language:EN
[1996/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0701316
Date:23.04.1997
[1997/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0701316
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.1997
ClassificationInternational:H02K41/035, H05K13/04, B23P19/00
[1996/11]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1996/11]
TitleGerman:Betätiger mit drehender und translatorischer Bewegung[1996/11]
English:Improved actuator with translational and rotational control[1996/11]
French:Actionneur pour un mouvement de translation et rotation[1996/11]
Examination procedure06.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/32]
30.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1999Fee for grant paid
14.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH10.05.2000
ES10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
[2002/26]
Former [2002/02]CH10.05.2000
LI10.05.2000
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0614265  (SMC CORP [US]) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 14-16 [Y] 1-10,12,13;
 [Y]US4231153  (BROWNE LAWRENCE T) [Y] 1-10,12 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 8 * * abstract *;
 [YA]DE3938088  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 13 * abstract * [A] 8,14-16;
 [A]US5251372  (HOUGHTON JON C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 47 * * abstract *;
 [A]FR2562751  (USM CORP [US]) [A] 14-16 * abstract *