Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0664643

EP0664643 - Image processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 06.02.2008  [2008/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/30]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohta, Takatoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Yamada, Koji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1995/30]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/30]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date95300317.519.01.1995
[1995/30]
Priority number, dateJP1994000464720.01.1994         Original published format: JP 464794
JP1994016209414.07.1994         Original published format: JP 16209494
[1995/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0664643
Date:26.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0664643
Date:06.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0664643
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP19.10.1995
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/405
[1995/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1995/30]
TitleGerman:Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und -gerät[1995/30]
English:Image processing method and apparatus[1995/30]
French:Procédé et appareil de traitement d'images[1995/30]
Examination procedure17.04.1996Examination requested  [1996/24]
30.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.1999Fee for grant paid
20.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
IT12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
[2008/06]
Former [2006/14]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
FR12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
Former [2004/07]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
GR12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
DK12.07.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2003/08]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
NL12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
ES12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2002/02]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
CH12.04.2000
LI12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/26]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
SE12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/16]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
PT12.07.2000
FR08.09.2000
Former [2001/11]AT12.04.2000
BE12.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0576786  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 34 * [A] 2-15;
 [YA]EP0272147  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1 * page 13, line 1 - page 15, line 42 * [A] 2-15;
 [D]JPS63155950  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD);
 [A]US4680645  (DISPOTO GARY J [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 3, line 30 - column 5, line 3 *