Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0665004

EP0665004 - An antimicrobial cosmetic pigment, its production process, and a cosmetic containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCKY LTD.
No. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[1995/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Seo, Dong Sung
101-502ho Lucky Apt., 254 Boonpyeong-dong
Cheongju City, Choongcheongbuk-do / KR
02 / Kang, Se Hun
A-502ho Lucky Apt., Bongmyeong-dong
Cheongju City, Choongcheongbuk-do / KR
03 / Choi, Sung Won
2-1406ho Miseong Apt., Shinsa 2-dong
Eunpyeong-ku, Seoul / KR
[1995/31]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1995/31]Votier, Sidney David
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date95300452.025.01.1995
[1995/31]
Priority number, dateKR1994000165929.01.1994         Original published format: KR 9401659
[1995/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0665004
Date:02.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0665004
Date:21.08.1996
[1996/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0665004
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.07.1996
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00
[1995/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1995/31]
TitleGerman:Antimikrobielles kosmetisches Pigment, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und dieses enthaltende Kosmetika[1995/31]
English:An antimicrobial cosmetic pigment, its production process, and a cosmetic containing it[1995/31]
French:Pigment cosmétique anti-microbien, procédé de préparation et compositions cosmétiques le contenant[1995/31]
Examination procedure02.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/44]
16.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.1999Fee for grant paid
30.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JPH0687714  ;
 [Y]JPH06216408  ;
 [Y]JPH0381209
 [Y]  - 1, vol. 94, no. 17, Database accession no. 94-140927, XP002005599 [Y] 1,2,4,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870620), vol. 11, no. 193, Database accession no. (C - 430)<2640> , [Y] 1,2,4,10 * abstract *
 [Y]  - 1, vol. 91, no. 20, Database accession no. 91-144792, XP002005600 [Y] 1,2,4,10 * abstract *