Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0677818

EP0677818 - Image pre-processor for character recognition system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2001
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2001 [2001/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1995/42]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Al-Hussein, Hussein, c/o Canon K.K.
30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1995/42]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/42]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date95301160.822.02.1995
[1995/42]
Priority number, dateUS1994022837215.04.1994         Original published format: US 228372
[1995/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0677818
Date:18.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0677818
Date:18.09.1996
[1996/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0677818
Date:10.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.1996
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/32, G06K9/34, G06K9/20, G06K9/38
[1995/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/42]
TitleGerman:Bildvorverarbeitung für Zeichenerkennungsanlage[1995/42]
English:Image pre-processor for character recognition system[1995/42]
French:Préprocesseur d'image pour système de reconnaissance de caractères[1995/42]
MiscellaneousEPB 1997/43: Teilanmeldung 97202407.9 eingereicht am 14/07/97
EPB 1997/43: Divisional application 97202407.9 filed on 14/07/97
EPB 1997/43: Demande divisionnaire 97202407.9 déposée le 14/07/97
Examination procedure29.01.1997Examination requested  [1997/13]
07.03.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2000Fee for grant paid
13.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP97202407.9  / EP0811946
Opposition(s)13.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0176910  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13,17,18,21,25,26,29,89 * page 4, line 14 - line 22 * * page 7, line 13 - line 23 *;
 [X]EP0431962  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,16-18,24-26,32,89 * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 28 *;
 [A]US5181260  (KUROSU YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,17,25 * column 4, line 17 - line 60 *;
 [A]JPH02214976  ;
 [A]EP0117823  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [A] 53-60 * abstract *;
 [X]  - CIPOVIC H ET AL, "ADAPTIVE THRESHOLDING IN 3-D SCENE DESCRIPTION", ROBOTICS AND COMPUTER INTEGRATED MANUFACTURING, (19900101), vol. 7, no. 3 / 04, pages 365 - 369, XP000178814 [X] 33-52 * chapter "ADAPTIVE THRESHOLDING" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0736-5845(90)90023-2
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901113), vol. 014, no. 516, Database accession no. (P - 1130), [A] 37,42,47,52 * abstract *
 [A]  - CLARKE A T ET AL, "USING A MICRO TO AUTOMATE DATA ACQUISITION IN MUSIC PUBLISHING", MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING, (19880801), vol. 24, no. 1 - 05, pages 549 - 553, XP000112076 [A] 53-60 * Chapter 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6074(88)90109-3
 [A]  - SAIFULLAH Y ET AL, "CLASSIFICATION-BASED SEGMENTATION OF ZIP CODES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, (19930901), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 1437 - 1443, XP000417071 [A] 53-60 * Chapter III-C *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/21.260675
 [X]  - HONGO Y ET AL, "Stamped character inspection apparatus based on the bit matrix method", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, MUNICH, WEST GERMANY, 19-22 OCT. 1982, 1982, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 448 - 450 vol.1, XP002008979 [X] 61-65,71,77,83 * Chapter 2; Chapter 3, first paragraph *